+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0222
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Education; 011-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
- Referred to Assignments
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield