+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (28)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 23, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Juvenile Justice Reform Committee
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. James H. Meyer
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr.
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brent Hassert
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Dunn
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry R. Ramey, Jr.
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins
- Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell
- Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron Schock
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe
- Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/11-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 11-6
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor