+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 17, 2002 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor