+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 25, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Stephens
+ − Statutes Amended (35)
- 720 ILCS 570/102 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1102
- 720 ILCS 570/201 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1201
- 720 ILCS 570/202 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1202
- 720 ILCS 570/205 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1205
- 720 ILCS 570/207 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1207
- 720 ILCS 570/209 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1209
- 720 ILCS 570/211 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1211
- 720 ILCS 570/214 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1214
- 720 ILCS 570/301 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1301
- 720 ILCS 570/302 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1302
- 720 ILCS 570/303 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1303
- 720 ILCS 570/303.05 -
- 720 ILCS 570/303.1 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1303.1
- 720 ILCS 570/304 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1304
- 720 ILCS 570/305 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1305
- 720 ILCS 570/306 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1306
- 720 ILCS 570/309 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1309
- 720 ILCS 570/312 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1312
- 720 ILCS 570/313 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1313
- 720 ILCS 570/318 -
- 720 ILCS 570/405 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1405
- 720 ILCS 570/405.1 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1405.1
- 720 ILCS 570/410 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1410
- 720 ILCS 570/501 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1501
- 720 ILCS 570/501.1 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1501.1
- 720 ILCS 570/505 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1505
- 720 ILCS 570/507 - from Ch. 56 1/2, par. 1507
- 720 ILCS 570/204 rep. -
- 720 ILCS 570/206 rep. -
- 720 ILCS 570/208 rep. -
- 720 ILCS 570/210 rep. -
- 720 ILCS 570/212 rep. -
- 720 ILCS 570/213 rep. -
- 720 ILCS 570/216 rep. -
- 720 ILCS 570/217 rep. -
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor