+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On August 7, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0309
- Effective Date August 7, 2015
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2015
- Do Pass Higher Education; 008-000-000
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Higher Education
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Higher Education
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Balanced Budget Note Filed
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 015-000-000
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen
+ − Statutes Amended (11)
- 110 ILCS 305/7e-5 -
- 110 ILCS 520/8d-5 -
- 110 ILCS 660/5-88 -
- 110 ILCS 665/10-88 -
- 110 ILCS 670/15-88 -
- 110 ILCS 675/20-88 -
- 110 ILCS 680/25-88 -
- 110 ILCS 685/30-88 -
- 110 ILCS 690/35-88 -
- 110 ILCS 805/6-4 - from Ch. 122, par. 106-4
- 110 ILCS 805/6-4a -
+ − Votes (4)
May 26, 2015: HB3692 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 26, 2015
May 5, 2015: HB3692 - Higher Education - May 05, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB3692 - Third Reading - Tuesday, April 14, 2015
March 18, 2015: HB3692 - Higher Education - Mar 18, 2015
+ − Sponsors (34)
Type:
Primary Sponsor