+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2016
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On April 22, 2016 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katherine Cloonen
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Restores a provision concerning the requirements for issuance of parking meter exempt decals or devices to a person with disabilities. Provides that in issuing parking meter-exempt decals or devices to parents or guardians of people with disabilities, the person with disabilities shall be a person who is incapable of driving and does not have an Illinois driver's license. Provides that the meter-exempt decal or device may be used by the authorized holder to designate and identify a vehicle when the vehicle is being used to transport a person or persons with disabilities and that person with disabilities is unable to drive on his or her own.
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/11-1301.2 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 11-1301.2
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2016: HB3689 - Third Reading
March 25, 2015: HFA0002 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety - Mar 25, 2015
March 18, 2015: HB3689 - Transportation: Vehicles & Safety - Mar 18, 2015
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor