+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On February 18, 2022 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brad Halbrook
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 720 ILCS 5/24-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 24-6
- 725 ILCS 5/112A-14 - from Ch. 38, par. 112A-14
- 750 ILCS 60/214 - from Ch. 40, par. 2312-14
- 765 ILCS 1030/2 - from Ch. 141, par. 142
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor