+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0157
- Effective Date July 1, 2017
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Waive Posting Notice
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Postponed - Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 096-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill, but with the following change: Replaces all references to "payor of income" with "payor". Effective July 1, 2017.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In provisions concerning administrative liens and levies on real property and personal property for past-due child support, provides that the State shall have a lien on all legal and equitable interests of a payor of income, as that term is described in the Income Withholding for Support Act, in the payor's real or personal property in the amount of any fine imposed by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services pursuant to the Income Withholding for Support Act. Adds a payor of income to certain provisions concerning notice and the execution of notices of administrative liens and levies. Provides that the notice must contain a legal description of the real property to be levied and the fact that a lien is being claimed for the fines imposed on a payor of income pursuant to the Income Withholding for Support Act, in addition to other information. Makes other changes. Amends the Income Withholding for Support Act. Sets forth additional administrative fines to existing fines or penalties against a payor of income provided for under the Act and provides that the new administrative fines do not affect who would be entitled to receive those existing fines and penalties. Provides that in addition to any fines or penalties provided for in the Act, when a payor of income wilfully fails, after receiving 2 reminders from the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, to withhold or pay over income pursuant to a properly served income withholding notice or otherwise fails to comply with any duties imposed by the Act, the Department may impose a fine upon the payor of income not to exceed $1,000 per payroll period; and that the fine shall be payable to the Department and may be used to defray the costs incurred by the Department in the collection of the past-due support and penalties provided for in the Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to place the fines collected into a special fund created to implement the purposes of this provision. Provides that after deducting the costs incurred by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services in the collection of the past-due support and penalties provided for in the Act, the reminder of the fines collected shall be distributed proportionally to the counties based on their population; and that the counties shall use these funds to assist low income families in defraying the costs associated with seeking parenting time.