+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Human Services
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed as Introduced, from the Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services.
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On March 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 21, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. William B. Black
On February 16, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Tryon
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 23, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 15, 2007: HB0368 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 15, 2007
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor