+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 8, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Aaron Schock
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Aaron Schock
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Aaron Schock
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Aaron Schock