+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Aging Committee; 013-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Aging Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack McGuire
+ − Statute Amended
- 20 ILCS 105/4.02 - from Ch. 23, par. 6104.02
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor