+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (46)
On August 21, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0433
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 21, 2015
On June 29, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 111-000-000
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-009-000
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Smiddy
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-002-000
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 22, 2015 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 010-000-005
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
- Assigned to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 109-006-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Standard Debate Human Services Committee; 008-006-000
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Mike Smiddy
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Smiddy
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause with the engrossed bill with the following changes: Removes references to breast tomosynthesis and to the American Cancer Society's guidelines for the appropriate use of screening MRIs for women at high risk for breast cancer.
House Amendment 001
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that for the purposes of defining low-dose mammography, digital mammography shall include breast tomosynthesis. Defines "breast tomosynthesis". Makes similar changes in the Health Maintenance Organization Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code.
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
- 215 ILCS 5/356g - from Ch. 73, par. 968g
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-5
- 305 ILCS 5/5-16.8 -
- 305 ILCS 5/12-4.49 new -
- 215 ILCS 125/4-6.1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1408.7
- 215 ILCS 125/4-6.1 -
+ − Votes (8)
May 31, 2015: SCA0002 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 27, 2015: SCA0002 - Appropriations-Human Services - May 27, 2015
May 22, 2015: HB3673 - Third Reading - Friday, May 22, 2015
May 13, 2015: HB3673 - Insurance - May 13, 2015
May 13, 2015: SCA0002 - Insurance - May 13, 2015
April 15, 2015: HB3673 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 15, 2015
March 25, 2015: HCA0001 - Human Services - Mar 25, 2015
March 25, 2015: HB3673 - Human Services - Mar 25, 2015
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor