+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 042-072-003
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue Committee; 009-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert S. Molaro
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Vote
April 3, 2003: HB3673 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 03, 2003
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor