+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 090-026-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 26, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Environment & Energy Committee; 016-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment & Energy Committee
On April 2, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On March 30, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 29, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 017-006-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes the express authorization that the Department of Natural Resources, the Department of Transportation, the State Fire Marshal, the Pollution Control Board, and the Environmental Protection Agency may engage the experts and additional resources that are reasonably necessary for implementing a process for expediting the issuance of permits and licenses for oil refineries.
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 20 ILCS 805/805-15 - was 20 ILCS 805/63a37
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-20 new -
- 20 ILCS 2905/2 - from Ch. 127 1/2, par. 2
- 415 ILCS 5/28.7 new -
+ − Vote
May 1, 2007: HB3671 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 01, 2007
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor