+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0292
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 006-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- To Commercial Law Subcommittee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Changes the short title of the new Act to the Limited Worker Cooperative Association Act. Authorizes the establishment of limited worker cooperative associations rather than limited cooperative associations. Eliminates patron members as a form of membership. Provides for multi-stakeholder cooperatives. Changes the effective date to January 1, 2020.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- New Act -
- 805 ILCS 310/22 - from Ch. 32, par. 326
- 815 ILCS 5/3 - from Ch. 121 1/2, par. 137.3
+ − Votes (5)
May 16, 2019: HB3663 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB3663 - Judiciary
April 3, 2019: HB3663 - Third Reading
March 27, 2019: HB3663 - Judiciary - Civil
March 20, 2019: HB3663 - Commercial Law Subcommittee
+ − Sponsors (41)
Type:
Primary Sponsor