+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On August 20, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0493
- Effective Date August 20, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 28, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2021
- Do Pass Judiciary; 007-002-000
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
- Arrive in Senate
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-001-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 305/6 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.6