+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0035
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 28, 2019
On June 21, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 29, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 052-004-000
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
- Do Pass Executive; 013-003-000
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-013-000
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Amendment 002
Provides that any draw game tickets (rather than game tickets) that are approved for sale by lottery licensees are automatically approved for sale through the Internet program. Provides that nothing in the provisions shall also be construed as prohibiting the Lottery draw game tickets (rather than the Lottery tickets) authorized for sale through the Internet program from continuing to be sold at retail locations.
House Amendment 001
Changes the repeal date of the Department of the Lottery's Internet program from July 1, 2028 to July 1, 2022.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 29, 2019: HB3661 - Third Reading
May 8, 2019: HB3661 - Executive
April 11, 2019: HB3661 - Third Reading
April 9, 2019: HFA0002 - Executive
March 27, 2019: HB3661 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor