+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On August 25, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0693
- Effective Date August 25, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 26, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2009
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Link
- Second Reading
On May 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-000
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
On April 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On April 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 28, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed 067-040-004
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Authorizes the Department of Transportation to convey described parcels in Christian, Madison, and Rock Island counties and release a described easement acquired by the State for highway purposes in Christian County.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 30, 2009: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Saturday, May 30, 2009
May 18, 2009: HB3658 - Third Reading - Monday, May 18, 2009
March 24, 2009: HB3658 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 24, 2009
March 10, 2009: HB3658 - Tuesday, March 10, 2009
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor