+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Tabled
- Motion Prevailed
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Health Care Availability & Accessibility Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor