+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (65)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-022-001
- Motion Withdrawn Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Raoul
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Verification Withdrawn
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Verified
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-022-001
- Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Sen. Antonio Muñoz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 13, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-042-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Ron Sandack
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-004-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Fantasy Sports Contest Act to provide regulation of companies providing access to paid fantasy sports contests and protect Illinois consumers who play paid fantasy sports contests for prizes from unfair acts and practices that may arise in the gaming process. Provides for the licensure of fantasy sports contest operators by the Illinois Gaming Board. Contains provisions concerning definitions, applicability, authority of the Board, fantasy sports player accounts, data security requirements, restrictions on games offered, prohibited activities, advertising, withholding of delinquent child support, audits, annual reports, applications, background investigations, fees, imposition and distribution of a privilege tax, and limitations on taxation of fantasy sports contest operators. Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act to provide that the Fantasy Sports Contest Act is scheduled to be repealed on January 1, 2020. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code to add a fantasy sports contest operator licensed under the Fantasy Sports Contest Act to the definition of "State gaming licensee" under provisions concerning certification to any State gaming licensee of past due child support. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 to provide that participants in fantasy sports contests as defined and offered under the Fantasy Sports Contest Act shall not be convicted of gambling. Effective immediately.
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning qualifications for licensure as a cosmetologist by a barber school graduate.
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, and Nail Technology Act of 1985. Changes the short title of the Act to the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, Nail Technology, and Eyelash Extension Act of 1985. Includes the practice of eyelash extension application in the coverage of the Act. Provides that it is unlawful for any person to practice eyelash extension application except pursuant to the Act. Requires holders of an eyelash extension application license to display it in a place in the holder's principal office. Establishes requirements for licensure as an eyelash extension application technician and teacher. Establishes licensure renewal and continuing education requirements. Establishes a grandfather provision. Includes a member of the eyelash extension application profession as a member of the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, Nail Technology, and Eyelash Extension Application Board. Increases the Board membership to 12. Makes conforming changes in the Regulatory Sunset Act, the Massage Licensing Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections. In the Regulatory Sunset Act, extends the repeal of the Barber, Cosmetology, Esthetics, Hair Braiding, Nail Technology, and Eyelash Extension Act of 1985 from January 1, 2016 to January 1, 2026. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (41)
- 225 ILCS 410/3-9 new -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.26 -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.36 new -
- 225 ILCS 57/30 -
- 225 ILCS 410/1-1 - from Ch. 111, par. 1701-1
- 225 ILCS 410/1-2 - from Ch. 111, par. 1701-2
- 225 ILCS 410/1-4 -
- 225 ILCS 410/1-7 - from Ch. 111, par. 1701-7
- 225 ILCS 410/1-7.5 -
- 225 ILCS 410/1-10 - from Ch. 111, par. 1701-10
- 225 ILCS 410/1-11 - from Ch. 111, par. 1701-11
- 225 ILCS 410/Art. IIIB heading -
- 225 ILCS 410/3B-1 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703B-1
- 225 ILCS 410/3B-10 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3B-11 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3B-12 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3B-15 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3B-16 -
- 225 ILCS 410/Art. IIID heading -
- 225 ILCS 410/3D-5 -
- 225 ILCS 410/3E-2 -
- 225 ILCS 410/Art. IIIF heading new -
- 225 ILCS 410/3F-1 new -
- 225 ILCS 410/3F-2 new -
- 225 ILCS 410/3F-3 new -
- 225 ILCS 410/3F-4 new -
- 225 ILCS 410/3F-5 new -
- 225 ILCS 410/3F-6 new -
- 225 ILCS 410/4-1 -
- 225 ILCS 410/4-2 - from Ch. 111, par. 1704-2
- 225 ILCS 410/4-4 - from Ch. 111, par. 1704-4
- 225 ILCS 410/4-7 - from Ch. 111, par. 1704-7
- 225 ILCS 410/4-9 - from Ch. 111, par. 1704-9
- 225 ILCS 410/4-19 - from Ch. 111, par. 1704-19
- 225 ILCS 410/4-20 - from Ch. 111, par. 1704-20
- 730 ILCS 5/5-5-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-5-5
- 225 ILCS 410/3-3 - from Ch. 111, par. 1703-3
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 80/4.30 -
- 305 ILCS 5/10-17.15 -
- 720 ILCS 5/28-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 28-1