+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 28, 2014 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On October 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On August 1, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor