+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled
- Motion Prevailed
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Juliana Stratton
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-003-002
On March 1, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Juliana Stratton
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
+ − Vote
March 21, 2017: HB3645 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor