+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (66)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1035
- Effective Date August 25, 2014
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 114-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 013-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Laura Fine
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Kotowski
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2, 3
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-003-003
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2014
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 19, 2014
- Do Pass as Amended Insurance; 008-001-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Assigned to Insurance
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 10, 2014
- Arrive in Senate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 093-019-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-005-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
+ − Adopted Amendments (6)
Senate Amendment 003
Further amends the Illinois Insurance Code to provide that certain insurers must comply with the medical exceptions procedures and prior authorization form requirements established under the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Provides that no qualified health plans shall be offered for sale directly to consumers through the health insurance marketplace operating in the State (rather than no policy shall be offered for sale directly to consumers in this State as a qualified health plan), unless specified information is made available to the consumer a the time he or she is comparing policies and premiums, and makes conforming changes throughout the language. Changes references from "up-to-date formulary" to "most recently published formulary". Makes other changes.
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Provides that the Act may be referred to as the Health Insurance Consumer Protection Act of 2014 and sets forth findings and a purpose. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no policy shall be offered for sale directly to consumers in the State as a qualified health plan, as defined in the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, unless certain information is made available to the consumer at the time he or she is comparing policies and their premiums. Sets forth provisions concerning providing information and applicability. Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Provides that no health care plan shall be offered for sale directly to consumers in the State as a qualified health plan, as defined in the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, unless certain information is made available to the consumer at the time he or she is comparing policies and their premiums. Sets forth provisions concerning providing information and applicability. Provides that every health carrier that offers a qualified health plan, as defined in the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, directly to consumers in the State shall establish and maintain a medical exceptions process that allows covered persons or their authorized representatives to request any clinically appropriate prescription drug when certain conditions exist. Inserts provisions similar to the provisions of the engrossed bill (that amended the Illinois Insurance Code) with the following changes. Replaces references to "prior authorization form" with "paper or electronic prior authorization form". Provides that in the case of a denial, the health insurer shall provide the prescriber with information regarding the denial (rather than information regarding the procedure for submitting an appeal to the denial). Deletes a requirement that health insurers must provide confirmation of receipt of a prior authorization form within one hour after receipt of the prior authorization form. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 003
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that on and after January 1, 2015, a health insurer that provides prescription drug benefits must, within 72 hours after receipt of a prior authorization form from a prescribing provider or pharmacist, either approve or deny the prior authorization; and in the case of an expedited coverage determination, the health insurer must either approve or deny the prior authorization within 24 hours after receipt of the prior authorization form. In the case of a denial, requires the health insurer to provide the prescriber with the reason for the denial, an alternative covered medication, if applicable, and information regarding the procedure for submitting an appeal to the denial. Requires health insurers to provide confirmation of receipt of a prior authorization form within one hour after receipt of the prior authorization form. Provides that the provision concerning prior authorization forms and prescription benefits do not apply to plans for beneficiaries of Medicare or Medicaid. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (7)
- 215 ILCS 5/364.3 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5.12b new -
- 215 ILCS 5/355a - from Ch. 73, par. 967a
- 215 ILCS 134/15 -
- 215 ILCS 134/45.1 new -
- 215 ILCS 134/45.2 new -
- 215 ILCS 5/155.36 -