+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- Held in Local Government
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Local Government
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Charles A. Hartke
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On March 25, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Releases additional easements and makes additional land transfers.
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Releases additional easements and makes additional land transfers.
+ − Vote
April 2, 2003: HB3635 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 02, 2003
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor