+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On August 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 8, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On May 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. James H. Meyer
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -