+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0112
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date July 19, 2019
On June 11, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-018-000
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Human Services; 006-003-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
- Referred to Assignments
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-044-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee; 012-001-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Child Care Accessibility & Early Childhood Education Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statute Amended
- 225 ILCS 10/4.2 - from Ch. 23, par. 2214.2
+ − Votes (4)
May 30, 2019: HB3631 - Third Reading
May 1, 2019: HB3631 - Human Services
March 28, 2019: HB3631 - Third Reading
March 14, 2019: HB3631 - Child Care Access & Early Childhood
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor