+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 1, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/24-6 - from Ch. 122, par. 24-6
- 30 ILCS 805/8.27 new -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor