+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On April 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On April 12, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On April 11, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate
- Second Reading - Standard Debate
On April 7, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 013-000-000
On April 6, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On April 5, 2005 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
On March 29, 2005 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
- Fiscal Note Filed
On March 28, 2005 in the House:
- Judicial Note Filed
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Filed
- Pension Note Filed
On March 15, 2005 in the House:
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Monique D. Davis
On March 10, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Standard Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-001
On March 1, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Restores the provision that requires a person to have been employed for a period of at least 5 years in an area requiring application of the individual's education in order to be issued a provisional alternative teaching certificate.