+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (43)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0444
- Effective Date June 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Nathan D. Reitz
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Schimpf
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 010-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2019
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Agriculture; 007-000-000
- Assigned to Agriculture
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 013-000-000
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that the Department of Natural Resources shall create a pilot program during the special 3-day, youth-only deer hunting season to allow for youth deer hunting permits that are valid statewide, excluding those counties or portions of counties closed to firearm deer hunting. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules to implement the pilot program. Provides that nothing shall be construed to prohibit the Department from issuing Special Hunt Area Permits for the youth-only deer hunting season or establishing, through administrative rule, additional requirements pertaining to the youth-only deer hunting season on Department-owned or Department-managed sites, including site-specific quotas or drawings. Provides that the provision become inoperative on January 1, 2023. Provides that no person shall have in his or her (rather than his) possession any firearm not authorized by administrative rule for a specific hunting season when taking deer. Provides that the Apprentice Hunter License shall be a non-renewable license that shall expire on the March 31 following the date of issuance (rather than a one-time, non-renewable license). Provides that the license shall entitle the licensee to hunt on private property while supervised by a validly licensed resident or nonresident hunter who is 21 years of age or older and to hunt on public property while supervised by a validly licensed resident or nonresident who is 21 years of age or older and has a hunter education certificate.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 520 ILCS 5/3.1-5 -
- 520 ILCS 5/2.26 - from Ch. 61, par. 2.26