+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On September 11, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0596
- Effective Date September 11, 2007
- Governor Approved
On July 13, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 099-000-000
On June 8, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 15, 2007
On May 31, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 8, 2007
On May 30, 2007 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Bost
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 29, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 28, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
On May 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2007
On May 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2007
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Kotowski
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On May 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On May 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 009-000-000
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 28, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Bost
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that nothing in the bill requires the removal or relocation of any existing flags currently displayed. Provides that the bill does not apply to a State facility if the requirements of the bill cannot be satisfied without a physical modification to that facility.
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (3)
June 14, 2007: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Thursday, June 14, 2007
May 28, 2007: HB3618 - Third Reading - Monday, May 28, 2007
April 19, 2007: HB3618 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 19, 2007
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor