+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 27, 2009 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0080
- Effective Date July 27, 2009
- Governor Approved
On June 17, 2009 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 19, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 18, 2009
- Second Reading
On May 7, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009
- Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Postponed - Judiciary
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 022-000-000
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee
On January 30, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2009 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
+ − Statute Amended
- 705 ILCS 505/8 - from Ch. 37, par. 439.8
+ − Votes (2)
May 19, 2009: HB0361 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 19, 2009
March 24, 2009: HB0361 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 24, 2009
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor