+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 010-001-000
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony
+ − Statute Amended
- 730 ILCS 5/3-14-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-14-1
+ − Vote
March 24, 2015: HB3609 - Judiciary - Criminal - Mar 24, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor