+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 720 ILCS 5/25-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 25-1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor