+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0382
- Effective Date August 17, 2015
- Governor Approved
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Pension Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
- State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Morrison
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon