+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 20, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0572
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-001-001
On May 23, 2003 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Susana Mendoza; Motion #1
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Education; 010-000-000
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Education; 009-000-000
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Education
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On March 24, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-003-006
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana Mendoza
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Provides that an applicant for a certificate who is not a citizen of the United States must sign and file with the State Board of Education a letter of intent indicating that either (i) within 10 years after the date that the letter is filed or (ii) at the earliest opportunity after the person becomes eligible to apply for U.S. citizenship, the person will apply for U.S. citizenship.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 105 ILCS 5/21-1 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-1
- 105 ILCS 5/21-11.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 21-11.1
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2003: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Tuesday, May 27, 2003
May 13, 2003: HB3587 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
March 21, 2003: HB3587 - Third Reading - Friday, March 21, 2003
+ − Sponsors (66)
Type:
Primary Sponsor