+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (60)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0099
- Effective Date July 15, 2021
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 House Concurs 113-005-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter
- Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 5
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Adopted; Peters
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 25, 2021
- Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1) this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters
- Assigned to Criminal Law
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-004-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-007-000
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 005
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as engrossed, with the following changes: Provides that the task force shall study innovative ways to reduce the prison population in Illinois from initiations of resentencing motions filed by incarcerated individuals, in addition to State's Attorneys, the Illinois Department of Corrections, and the judicial branch. Removes language concerning refocusing the workforce in communities where many jobs are with law enforcement and the Illinois Department of Corrections. Provides that the Illinois Sentencing Policy Advisory Council (rather than the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority) shall provide support to the task force. Provides that the task force shall provide specified recommendations before July 1, 2022 (rather than January 1, 2022). Removes a task force member representing the interests of members of a labor union. Provides for an additional task force member who shall be a member of law enforcement appointed by an association representing law enforcement. Provides for an additional task force member representing the private criminal defense bar. Provides for an additional task force member appointed by the Public Defender's Association. Provides for 3 task force members who are retired judges (rather than one). Provides for an additional task force member appointed by the Department of Corrections.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the Resentencing Task Force Act. Provides that the task force shall study innovative ways to reduce the prison population in Illinois from initiations of resentencing motions filed by State's Attorneys, the Illinois Department of Corrections and the judicial branch. Provides that the task force further aims to acknowledge that employees who work for the Illinois Department of Corrections and other members of law enforcement may be affected by the reduction of the prison population. Provides that the task force shall consider ways to train and refocus the workforce in communities where many jobs are with the Illinois Department of Corrections and law enforcement. Provides that the task force shall consist of specific members. Provides that the task force shall meet no less than 4 times and shall provide recommendations for legislation to the General Assembly and the Governor's Office on or before January 1, 2022. Provides that the members of the task force shall serve without compensation. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority shall provide administrative and technical support for the task force and are responsible for appointing a chairperson and ensuring the requirements of the task force are met. Contains a findings provision. Effective immediately.