+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- To Agency Operation Subcommittee
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor