+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 10, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0053
- Effective Date August 10, 2007
- Governor Approved
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 15, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-001
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2007
- Do Pass Education; 008-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On February 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 23, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 019-000-000
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Statute Amended
- 105 ILCS 5/17-2A - from Ch. 122, par. 17-2A
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2007: HB0357 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 15, 2007
February 22, 2007: HB0357 - Third Reading - Thursday, February 22, 2007
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor