+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (64)
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0636
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 10, 2020
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 24, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 062-047-001
On May 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On May 23, 2020 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Gregory Harris
On May 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-019-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
On May 23, 2020 in the House:
- Arrived in House
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Gregory Harris
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
- Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019
- Do Pass State Government; 006-003-000
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-assigned to State Government
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to State Government
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 070-038-003
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
- Removed from Short Debate Status
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-004-000
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 16, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Creates the FY2021 Budget Implementation Act. Provides that the purpose of the Act is to make the changes in State programs that are necessary to implement the Governor's FY2021 budget recommendations. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Defines "commercially available off-the-shelf item" for the purposes of the Procurement of Domestic Products Act.
+ − Proposed Amendments (3)
+ − Statutes Amended (76)
- 30 ILCS 517/5 -
- 30 ILCS 517/10 -
- 30 ILCS 517/25 -
- New Act -
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45.1 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45.2 new -
- 20 ILCS 605/605-705 - was 20 ILCS 605/46.6a
- 20 ILCS 605/605-707 - was 20 ILCS 605/46.6d
- 20 ILCS 605/605-1045 new -
- 20 ILCS 1305/10-25 -
- 20 ILCS 1505/1505-210 -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.930 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.931 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.932 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.933 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5h.5 -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-45 -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-57 -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-63 -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-70 -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-100 -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-120 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-121 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-122 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.3 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.3
- 30 ILCS 105/8.12 - from Ch. 127, par. 144.12
- 30 ILCS 105/8g-1 -
- 30 ILCS 105/13.2 - from Ch. 127, par. 149.2
- 30 ILCS 105/25 - from Ch. 127, par. 161
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-27 -
- 30 ILCS 110/5 new -
- 30 ILCS 115/12 - from Ch. 85, par. 616
- 30 ILCS 120/16 - from Ch. 85, par. 666
- 30 ILCS 160/2 - from Ch. 127, par. 4002
- 30 ILCS 730/3 - from Ch. 96 1/2, par. 8203
- 30 ILCS 740/2-3 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 663
- 30 ILCS 767/15-10 -
- 35 ILCS 5/901 -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.25f - from Ch. 127, par. 144.25f
- 35 ILCS 105/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.9
- 35 ILCS 110/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.39
- 35 ILCS 115/9 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.109
- 35 ILCS 120/3 - from Ch. 120, par. 442
- 70 ILCS 210/13 - from Ch. 85, par. 1233
- 70 ILCS 210/13.2 - from Ch. 85, par. 1233.2
- 70 ILCS 3615/4.09 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 704.09
- 20 ILCS 2705/2705-575 - was 20 ILCS 2705/49.28
- 30 ILCS 105/5.107 rep. -
- 30 ILCS 105/6p-3 - from Ch. 127, par. 142p3
- 30 ILCS 105/8.8a - from Ch. 127, par. 144.8a
- 30 ILCS 605/7b -
- 415 ILCS 20/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 7053
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5.4 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-5.4
- 305 ILCS 5/5H-4 -
- 305 ILCS 5/12-4.53 new -
- 305 ILCS 20/6 - from Ch. 111 2/3, par. 1406
- 305 ILCS 20/18 -
- 415 ILCS 5/22.15 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1022.15
- 415 ILCS 5/55.6 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 1055.6
- 415 ILCS 5/57.11 -
- 625 ILCS 5/3-821 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-821
- 705 ILCS 105/27.3b-1 -
- 705 ILCS 135/10-5 -
- 705 ILCS 135/15-70 -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-12-3a - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-12-3a
- 730 ILCS 5/3-12-6 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-12-6
- 765 ILCS 1026/15-801 -
- 210 ILCS 49/5-106 -
- 30 ILCS 105/6z-20.1 -
- 30 ILCS 105/8.53 -
- 65 ILCS 5/11-101-3 -
- 20 ILCS 605/605-1050 new -
- 5 ILCS 100/5-45.3 new -
- 305 ILCS 5/5-5.7a new -
- 305 ILCS 5/12-4.35 -
- 25 ILCS 10/20 new -
+ − Votes (5)
May 23, 2020: HB0357 - Third Reading
May 23, 2020: SFA0002 - Concurrence
May 15, 2019: HB0357 - State Government
April 10, 2019: HB0357 - Third Reading
February 14, 2019: HB0357 - State Government Administration
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor