+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (63)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0616
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses
- Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 058-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 18, 2003
- Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 116-001-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 4, 2003
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Governor Amendatory Veto
- Sent to the Governor
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 1, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary K. O'Brien; Motion #1
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mary K. O'Brien; Motion #1
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2003
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 and 2
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Judiciary; 007-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
- Assigned to Judiciary
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 013-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary K. O'Brien
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Prohibits the Illinois Department of Corrections from hiring or allowing sex offenders to hire an individual or entity to provide sex offender evaluation or treatment services unless the services are provided by an individual approved by the Sex Offender Management Board.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill. Provides that the evaluation requirements apply only to felony sex offenders. Provides that money deposited into the Sex Offender Management Board Fund shall be administered by the Sex Offender Management Board and may also be used to fund practices endorsed or required under the Sex Offender Management Board Act, including but not limited to sex offender evaluation, treatment, and monitoring programs that are or may be developed by the agency providing supervision, the Department of Corrections, or the Department of Human Services. Provides that this Fund shall also be used for administrative costs, including staff, incurred by the Board. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that $10 for the initial registration fee of a sex offender and $5 of the annual renewal fee shall be used by the registering agency for official purposes. $10 of the initial registration fee and $5 of the annual fee shall be deposited into the Sex Offender Management Board Fund. Changes the effective date of the bill to January 1, 2004.
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes all. Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill. Provides that the evaluation requirements apply only to felony sex offenders. Provides that money deposited into the Sex Offender Management Board Fund shall be administered by the Sex Offender Management Board and may also be used to fund practices endorsed or required under the Sex Offender Management Board Act, including but not limited to sex offender evaluation, treatment, and monitoring programs that are or may be developed by the agency providing supervision, the Department of Corrections, or the Department of Human Services. Provides that this Fund shall also be used for administrative costs, including staff, incurred by the Board. Amends the Sex Offender Registration Act. Provides that $10 for the initial registration fee of a sex offender and $5 of the annual renewal fee shall be used by the registering agency for official purposes. $10 of the initial registration fee and $5 of the annual fee shall be deposited into the Sex Offender Management Board Fund. Changes the effective date of the bill to January 1, 2004.
+ − Statutes Amended (24)
- 20 ILCS 4026/10 -
- 20 ILCS 4026/15 -
- 20 ILCS 4026/16 new -
- 20 ILCS 4026/17 new -
- 20 ILCS 4026/18 new -
- 705 ILCS 405/5-701 -
- 705 ILCS 405/5-715 -
- 725 ILCS 205/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 105-8
- 725 ILCS 207/10 -
- 725 ILCS 207/25 -
- 725 ILCS 207/30 -
- 725 ILCS 207/40 -
- 725 ILCS 207/55 -
- 725 ILCS 207/60 -
- 725 ILCS 207/65 -
- 730 ILCS 5/3-3-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-3-7
- 730 ILCS 5/3-6-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-6-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-9-7 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-9-7
- 730 ILCS 5/5-3-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-3-1
- 730 ILCS 5/5-3-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-3-2
- 730 ILCS 5/5-4-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-4-1
- 730 ILCS 5/5-6-3 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-6-3
- 730 ILCS 5/5-7-1 - from Ch. 38, par. 1005-7-1
- 730 ILCS 110/15.1 - from Ch. 38, par. 204-7.1