+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 11, 2003 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0510
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
On June 11, 2003 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
On April 29, 2003 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
On April 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000
On March 19, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 20, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On March 18, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 018-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah L. Graham
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Adoption Act. Provides that a consent or surrender for adoption is not required from a person found by the court to have been indicated for child sexual abuse as defined in the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act that involved sexual penetration of the mother or a person found to be at least 5 years older than the mother and the mother was under the age of 17 at the time of conception of the child to be adopted.
+ − Statute Amended
- 750 ILCS 50/8 - from Ch. 40, par. 1510
+ − Votes (2)
May 13, 2003: HB3552 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 13, 2003
March 19, 2003: HB3552 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 19, 2003
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor