+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 25, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date June 25, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0018
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 30, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Executive- Procurement
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 105-002-001
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit