+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 2, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 29, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 9(b); May 2, 2003
On March 27, 2003 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On March 6, 2003 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan
On March 5, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 28, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David E. Miller
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor