+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- To Medicaid & Managed Care Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 29, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 28, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor