+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (49)
On August 19, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0405
- Effective Date August 19, 2015
- Governor Approved
On July 22, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 080-022-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On June 22, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 30, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 054-002-000
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCann
- Second Reading
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Executive; 013-000-001
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Re-assigned to Executive
On May 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- To Subcommittee on Gaming
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-014-000
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 010-000-000
- Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee
- Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 005-000-000
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- To Finance Subcommittee
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that Cook County may, and other counties shall, establish a system for the licensing of organizations to operate poker runs.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 230 ILCS 15/0.01 - from Ch. 85, par. 2300
- 230 ILCS 15/1 - from Ch. 85, par. 2301
- 230 ILCS 15/2 - from Ch. 85, par. 2302
- 230 ILCS 15/5 - from Ch. 85, par. 2305
- 230 ILCS 15/6 - from Ch. 85, par. 2306
+ − Votes (6)
June 23, 2015: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Tuesday, June 23, 2015
May 30, 2015: HB3538 - Third Reading - Saturday, May 30, 2015
May 20, 2015: HB3538 - Executive - May 20, 2015
April 16, 2015: HB3538 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 16, 2015
March 26, 2015: HB3538 - Finance Subcommittee - Mar 26, 2015
March 26, 2015: HB3538 - Revenue & Finance - Mar 26, 2015
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor