+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0287
- Effective Date August 9, 2019
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019
- Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 15 ILCS 335/5 - from Ch. 124, par. 25
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-106