+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0513
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 039-016-000
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2019
- Second Reading
- Do Pass Transportation; 013-005-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2019
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2019
- Postponed - Transportation
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019
- Postponed - Transportation
- Postponed - Transportation
- Assigned to Transportation
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2019
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-038-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-003-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Identification Card Act and the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that upon the first issuance of a request for proposals for a digital driver's license and identification card issuance and facial recognition system issued after the effective date of this amendatory Act, and upon implementation of a new or revised system procured pursuant to that request for proposals, the Secretary of State shall permit applicants to choose between "male", "female", or "non-binary" when designating the applicant's sex on identification card and driver's license application forms. Provides that the sex designated by the applicant shall be displayed on the identification card or driver's license issued to the applicant.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 15 ILCS 305/30 new -
- 15 ILCS 335/5 - from Ch. 124, par. 25
- 625 ILCS 5/6-106 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 6-106