+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Tabled
- Motion Prevailed
On March 14, 2017 in the House:
- To Workers Compensation Subcommittee
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Grant Wehrli
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
- 820 ILCS 305/6 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.6
- 820 ILCS 305/8 - from Ch. 48, par. 138.8
- 820 ILCS 305/8.1b -
- 820 ILCS 305/8.2 -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor