+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Harris
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Harris
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -