+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (59)
On July 14, 2015 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0033
- Effective Date January 1, 2016
- Governor Approved
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- House Concurs
- Verified
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 060-046-002
- (M1) Motion to suspend Rule 15(d) - Prevailed
- (M1) Motion to suspend Rule 15(d)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Lost 055-054-001
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-002-000
On May 26, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On May 25, 2015 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 032-017-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; McCann
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Agriculture; 005-001-000
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2015
- Second Reading
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015
- Do Pass Agriculture; 008-001-000
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 17, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-043-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-002-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 014-002-000
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 001
Provides that the harvest of bobcats in this State shall be non-detrimental, as defined by federal regulations (50 CFR 23.61), and as determined by the United States Fish and Wildlife Service in accordance with 50 CFR 23.69.
House Amendment 002
Amends bill by inserting a Section concerning Bobcat hunting and trapping permits and fees. Provides that before any person may lawfully hunt or trap a bobcat, he or she shall first obtain a "Bobcat Hunting and Trapping Permit". Provides the fee for a Bobcat Hunting and Trapping Permit shall not exceed $5. Allows the Department of Natural Resources to limit the number of Bobcat Hunting and Trapping Permits that are made available each season.
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30 - from Ch. 61, par. 2.30
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30b -
- 520 ILCS 5/2.33 - from Ch. 61, par. 2.33
- 520 ILCS 5/2.33a - from Ch. 61, par. 2.33a
- 520 ILCS 5/2.30c new -
+ − Votes (9)
May 31, 2015: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 31, 2015: SFA0001 - Concurrence - Sunday, May 31, 2015
May 26, 2015: SFA0001 - Agriculture & Conservation - May 26, 2015
May 21, 2015: HB0352 - Third Reading - Thursday, May 21, 2015
May 20, 2015: SFA0001 - Agriculture - May 20, 2015
May 14, 2015: HB0352 - Agriculture - May 14, 2015
April 17, 2015: HB0352 - Third Reading - Friday, April 17, 2015
April 14, 2015: HFA0002 - Agriculture & Conservation - Apr 14, 2015
March 24, 2015: HB0352 - Agriculture & Conservation - Mar 24, 2015
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor